Մաթեմատիկա

Կատարիր բազմապատկումը և ստուգիր գումարումով։

3×34=102

34+34+34=102

2×68=136

68+68=136

3×56=168

56+56+56=168

Կատարիր բազմապատկումը և արդյունքը ստուգիր բաժանումով։

34×18=612

612:18=34

56×49=2744

2744:49=56

Կատարիր բաժանումը և արդյունքը ստուգիր բազմապատկումով։

525։21=25

25×21=525

676:13=52

52×13=676

832:26=32

32×26=832

Leave a Reply

Fill in your details below or click an icon to log in:

WordPress.com Logo

You are commenting using your WordPress.com account. Log Out /  Change )

Twitter picture

You are commenting using your Twitter account. Log Out /  Change )

Facebook photo

You are commenting using your Facebook account. Log Out /  Change )

Connecting to %s